Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/06/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/28/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 10/28/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/11/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/14/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/14/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/27/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/21/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/22/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/22/2010