Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/05/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/30/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/09/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/09/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/09/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/08/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/20/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/20/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/22/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/03/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/03/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/25/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/15/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/08/2010