Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/23/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/23/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/23/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/29/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/05/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/24/2010