Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/23/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/29/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/05/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/19/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/02/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/04/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/08/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/08/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/22/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/22/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/25/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/26/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/14/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/08/2010