Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/30/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/28/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/25/2010