Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/14/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/22/2010