Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/28/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/06/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/09/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/10/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/22/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/10/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/20/2010