Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/28/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/18/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/03/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/17/2010