Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/11/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/10/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/23/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 08/10/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/29/2010