Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/14/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/10/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/10/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/10/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/17/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/17/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/09/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/20/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/29/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/29/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/30/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/13/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/09/2010