Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/04/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/04/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/2010