Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 04/02/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/02/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/02/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/30/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/30/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/30/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/07/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/21/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/28/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/29/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/23/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/23/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/23/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/23/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 10/23/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/23/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/29/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 11/06/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/17/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/02/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/15/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/15/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 12/15/2009