Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/28/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/28/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/30/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/04/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/04/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/07/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/12/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/09/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/09/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/12/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/09/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/14/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/16/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/20/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/30/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/31/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/10/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/14/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/14/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/14/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/21/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/27/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/28/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/03/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/08/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/15/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/16/2009