Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/21/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 04/21/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/21/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/04/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/05/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/22/2009