Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/13/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/12/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/07/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/11/2009