Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/22/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/27/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/28/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/13/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/13/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/19/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/15/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/17/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/24/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/24/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/22/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/24/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/25/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/29/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/30/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/30/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/07/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/08/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/13/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/13/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/14/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/16/2009