Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/22/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/06/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/06/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/10/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/01/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/01/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/01/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/01/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/01/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/01/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/08/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/08/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/16/2009