Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 04/21/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/29/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/29/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/30/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/04/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/13/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/13/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/13/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/13/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/18/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/18/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/19/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/09/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/10/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/15/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/19/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/26/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/07/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/09/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/09/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/22/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/02/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 12/03/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/03/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/08/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/08/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/10/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 01/13/2010
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 01/22/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/23/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/02/2010