Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/27/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/27/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/27/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/27/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/27/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/05/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/05/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/20/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/20/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/20/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/02/2009