Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/22/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/22/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/29/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/29/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/07/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/03/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/16/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/26/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 02/25/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/16/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/15/2010