Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/02/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/23/2009