Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/14/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/20/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/11/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/11/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/11/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/11/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/11/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/11/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/11/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/11/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/11/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/11/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/11/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/11/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/11/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/11/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/11/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/11/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/11/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/11/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/11/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/11/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/11/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/25/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/08/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/08/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/24/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/24/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/29/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/29/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/30/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/18/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/26/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/22/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/10/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/23/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/23/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/29/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/15/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/15/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/15/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/15/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/18/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 12/01/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/21/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/21/2010