Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/19/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/14/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/22/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/22/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/29/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/20/2010