Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/22/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/04/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/11/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/09/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/19/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/24/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/24/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/29/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/08/2010