Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/23/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/10/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/10/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/25/2010