Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/02/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/02/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/02/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/04/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/04/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/04/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/04/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/04/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/04/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/04/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/04/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/04/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/04/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/04/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/04/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/04/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/04/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/15/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/15/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/15/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/25/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/25/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/09/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/21/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/22/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/23/2010