Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/23/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/28/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/29/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/16/2009