Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/13/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/13/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/13/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/13/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/13/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/13/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/13/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/13/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/14/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/14/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/14/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/16/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/16/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/16/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/16/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/16/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/16/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/23/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/23/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/23/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/26/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/26/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/03/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/03/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/10/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/10/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/09/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/06/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/14/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/02/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/15/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/24/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/28/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/17/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/03/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/15/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/23/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/28/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 08/10/2010