Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/19/2009 Became Public Law No: 111-75.
10/19/2009 Signed by President.
10/07/2009 Presented to President.
09/24/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9857)
09/24/2009 Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/09/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9368-9369)
07/31/2009 Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-241.
04/22/2009 Introduced in House