Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/22/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/19/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/19/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/04/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/15/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/15/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/15/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/15/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/25/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/09/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/21/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/31/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/31/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/08/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/08/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/21/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/21/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/23/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/06/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 01/19/2010