Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/12/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/18/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/18/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/18/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/26/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/16/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/23/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/27/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/29/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/31/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/08/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/29/2009