Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/04/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/18/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/03/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/04/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/11/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/24/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/08/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/08/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/08/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/13/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/21/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 07/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/27/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/16/2010