Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/13/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/15/2009