Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/04/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/18/2010