Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/13/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/20/2010