Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 04/23/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/09/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/20/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/21/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew