Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/22/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/22/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/22/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/22/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/22/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/22/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/22/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/22/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/22/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/22/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/10/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/10/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/10/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/10/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/10/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/10/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/26/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/26/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/26/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/26/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/26/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/29/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/29/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/29/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/29/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/29/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/29/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/29/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/21/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/25/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/25/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/25/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/25/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/25/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/25/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/15/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/15/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/17/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/17/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/17/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/17/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/22/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 09/22/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/22/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/30/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/30/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/30/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/08/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/22/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/05/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 12/10/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 12/10/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/16/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/10/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/22/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/29/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/29/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/29/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/06/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/13/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/13/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/24/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/30/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/01/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/01/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/01/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/01/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/19/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/21/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/21/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/27/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/30/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/15/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/15/2010