Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/23/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/06/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/04/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/11/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/28/2010