Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/09/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/09/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/09/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/09/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/09/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/09/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/09/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/09/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/09/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/09/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/09/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/09/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/09/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/09/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/09/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/09/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/13/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/13/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/13/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/13/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/15/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/15/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/15/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/20/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/22/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/03/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/09/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/16/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/16/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/28/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/29/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/13/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/21/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/11/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/18/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/01/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/07/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/26/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/29/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/15/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/29/2010