Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/27/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/27/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/27/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/27/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/05/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/05/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/20/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/15/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/15/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/15/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/15/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/15/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/16/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/19/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/23/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/10/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/10/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/23/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/23/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/23/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/23/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/23/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/23/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/18/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/18/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/22/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/22/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/22/2010