Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 02/25/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/15/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/27/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/16/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/30/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/28/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/28/2010