Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/05/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/06/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/13/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/31/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/09/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/10/2010