There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Lung Cancer Mortality Reduction Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a comprehensive interagency response to reduce lung cancer mortality in a timely manner.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/27/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
06/08/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/01/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/28/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/27/2009Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
04/27/2009Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
04/27/2009Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
04/27/2009Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/27/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/10/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/10/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/20/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/24/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/23/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/23/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/23/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/17/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/18/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/01/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/01/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/02/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/10/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/10/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/11/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/11/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/13/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/24/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/02/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/26/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/04/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/16/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/01/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 12/15/2010

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/27/2009 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/28/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services04/27/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel06/08/2009 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs04/27/2009 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health05/01/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2112. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/27/2009)

Lung Cancer Mortality Reduction Act of 2009 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services (the HHS Secretary) to implement the Lung Cancer Mortality Reduction Program to achieve a reduction of at least 25% in the mortality rate of lung cancer by 2015. Includes within such program: (1) a strategic review and prioritization of research grants; (2) an expansion of research programs, such as on predispositions to lung cancer; and (3) the expedited development of computer assisted diagnostic, surgical, treatment, and drug testing innovations.

Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to apply provisions related to drugs for rare diseases or conditions to: (1) chemoprevention drugs for precancerous conditions of the lungs; (2) drugs for targeted therapeutic treatment of lung cancer; and (3) drugs to curtail or prevent nicotine addiction.

Requires the HHS Secretary to establish an early disease research and management program targeted at the high incidence and mortality rates of lung cancer among minority and low income populations.

Requires the Secretary of Defense (DOD) and the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to coordinate with the HHS Secretary in: (1) the development of the Lung Cancer Mortality Reduction Program; (2) the implementation of an early detection and disease management research program for military personnel and veterans whose smoking history and exposure to carcinogens during active duty service has increased their risk for lung cancer; and (3) the implementation of coordinated care programs for military personnel and veterans diagnosed with lung cancer.

Requires the HHS Secretary to convene a Lung Cancer Advisory Board to monitor the programs established under this Act.