Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/10/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/10/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/20/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/24/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/23/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/23/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/23/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/17/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/18/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/01/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/01/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/02/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/10/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/10/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/11/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/11/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/13/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/24/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/02/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/26/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/04/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/16/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/01/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 12/15/2010