Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 04/27/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/21/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/20/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/15/2010