Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 04/27/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/29/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/29/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/29/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/29/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/22/2010