Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/29/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/04/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/04/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/05/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/19/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/19/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/03/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/10/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/23/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/26/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/08/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/10/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/24/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/10/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/08/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/15/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/15/2010