Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/30/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/16/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/24/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/16/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/25/2010