Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/06/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/06/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/06/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/07/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/13/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/13/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/18/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/03/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/09/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/09/2009