Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/15/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/16/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/18/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/08/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/29/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/29/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/21/2010